Trustees HEARTBEAT SUPPORT WOKING
Charity number: 1125972

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNARD STOREY | Chair | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lesley White | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Euan Fyfe | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Skeel | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE LAWRENCE | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JEFFERIES | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Walter Hulatt | Trustee | 06 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.