EMEK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help & support for the poor deaf children and their parents/carers in Bangladesh and Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Nigeria
Governance
- 31 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAHFUZA RAHMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAPIA HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADLUNA EKUSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EMDAD TALUKDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £3.57k | £618 | £2.24k | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE LIVING WITH DEAFNESS IN THIS COUNTRY AS WELL AS IN POOR COUNTRIES LIKE BANGLADESH AND OTHERS SUBJECT TO FINANCIAL ABILITY. IN POOR COUNTRIES, EMEK WILL SUPPORT THE DEAF CHILDREN WITH FREE HEARING AIDS, BATTERIES, REPAIRS AND ONGOING SUPPORT AND TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 SUNBEAM CRESCENT
LONDON
W10 5DW
- Phone:
- 02089608840
- Email:
- talukderbari@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window