Financial history WASHWOOD HEATH MUSLIM CENTRE AND MADRASSAH QASIM-UL-ULOOM

Charity Number: 1125410
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.22k £24.44k £24.87k £116.87k £54.31k
Total expenditure £21.33k £17.06k £20.64k £120.65k £38.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.97k N/A N/A N/A