WASHWOOD HEATH MUSLIM CENTRE AND MADRASSAH QASIM-UL-ULOOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving Islamic education to the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSAIN SIDDIQUI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AQIL ALI KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAROOQ ALI KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.22k | £24.44k | £24.87k | £116.87k | £54.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.33k | £17.06k | £20.64k | £120.65k | £38.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 April 2025 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 April 2025 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 434 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 434 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2023 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE, ON A CHARITABLE BASIS, THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF SUNNI SHARI'A (JURI PRUDENCE) AND TO FACILITATE AND ASSIST IN PROMOTING, THROUGH THE ACTION(S) OF PRAYERS, AN UNDERSTANDING TO ENTIRE MUSLIM COMMUNITY ON NON-POLITICAL BASIS INCLUDING CLASSES WITHIN RELIGIOUS PLATFORM HAVING VARYING SCHOOLS OF THOUGHTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BIRMINGHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WASHWOOD HEATH MUSLIM CENTRE
790 WASHWOOD HEATH ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B8 2JG
- Phone:
- 07958495840
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window