THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION WESTON-SUPER-MARE BRANCH

Charity number: 1124820
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010

Total income: £2,407
Total expenditure: £2,791

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Other Charitable Activities

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2008: Standard registration
  • 07 June 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £3.01k £2.41k
Total expenditure £2.94k £2.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 15 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 20 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required