LEICESTERSHIRE EMPOWERMENT FOR AUTISM TODAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist clients with Autistic Spectrum Disorders and/or Learning Disabilities acquire life skills that will help them progress to Employment or Further Education and to provide support in the workplace for those clients in employment who require such support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 02 July 2008: Standard registration
- LEICESTERSHIRE EMPLOYMENT FOR AUTISM TODAY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Hunt | Chair | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Ann Rogers | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Ross | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Macaffer | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.77k | £86.38k | £86.78k | £78.61k | £63.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.06k | £94.58k | £93.30k | £97.94k | £70.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 01 September 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 September 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 2008 as amended on 29 Jul 2020 as amended on 12 Aug 2020 as amended on 10 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
The Objects are to deliver support and training to young people and adults with Autism Spectrum Conditions and/or Learning Difficulties and to provide advice, guidance and support to their parents and carers.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER CITY AND LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit F
Whiteacres
Cambridge Road
Leicester
LE8 6ZG
- Phone:
- 07730057401
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window