Trustees AAPG - EUROPE
Charity number: 1126290
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Wegener | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Gibbons | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Craig | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Richard Cook | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CURTISS | Trustee | 20 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.