OLIVE TREE RECONCILIATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith between Arab Christians and Messianic Jewish believers living in Israel , the Palestinian Areas (PA) and the wider Middle East by identifying their needs and making these needs known to the church worldwide ,relief of poverty through donations from Christians and to build bridges within the community in Israel and the PA in a spirit of reconciliation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Israel
- Jordan
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 03 September 2008: Standard registration
- 02 April 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.46k | £112.00k | £96.26k | £74.53k | £57.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.80k | £125.01k | £91.16k | £69.43k | £74.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 8 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTED DEED 3 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ( THE OBJECTS ) 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BETWEEN ARAB CHRISTIANS AND MESSIANIC JEWISH BELIEVERS LIVING IN ISRAEL BY IDENTIFYING THEIR NEEDS AND MAKING THESE NEEDS MET TO THE CHURCH WORLWIDE. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ISRAEL BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES, OR FACILITIES. 3) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY; A) PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING AND SUPPORT, IN A SPIRIT OF RECONCILIATION, BETWEEN BELIEVERS ( BOTH JEWISH AND ARAB ) IN THE HOLY LAND ( ISRAEL AND THE PALESTINE AREAS ) AND CHRISTIANS WORLWIDE. B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.S INCLUDING THOSE OF THE UNITED NATIONS AND THE INSTITUTIONS OF GOVERNMENT GENERALLY. = THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS. ½ SUPPORT OF DEMOCRATIC AND ACCOUNTABLE GOVERNANCE. O REFUSAL OF SUPPORT TO THOSE PROMOTING UNLAWFUL VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window