REDEMPTION HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS; RELIEF AND CARE OF THE POOR, SICK, AGED AND BEREAVED; ALLEVIATE POVERTY, ASSIST IN RURAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
- Ghana
Governance
- 03 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abram T Donkor | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KWABENA ODURO-KWARTENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE TWUMASI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALEX OBIRI-YEBOAH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.48k | £47.86k | £37.34k | £44.25k | £39.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.45k | £50.58k | £43.45k | £45.85k | £64.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 May 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
16 May 2025 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.1.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.1.4 TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
34B Osborne Road
Forest Gate
London
E7 0PH
- Phone:
- 02085340613
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window