Accounts and annual returns BUBBLECAR MUSEUM

Charity number: 1125431
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 01 March 2014 10 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2013 Not submitted