GIRTON COLLEGE

Charity number: 1137541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The College provides, in conjunction with the University of Cambridge, an education for some 700 undergraduate and graduate students which is recognised internationally as being of the highest standard. This education develops students academically and advances their leadership qualities and interpersonal skills, and so prepares them to play full and effective roles in society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elena Jane Buermann Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Sarah Grogan Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Anna Woolley Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Dr Antonios Ragkousis Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Dr James Palmer Wade Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Samuel David Grimshaw Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Rosie Frances Rice Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Jye Smallwood Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Revd Dr Charles John Mackinnon Bell Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Judith Drinkwater Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Helen Anne Van Noorden Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Harriet Dorothy Allen Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Benjamin John Griffin Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Jenny Kaye Blackhurst Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Gail Antoinette Williams Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Simon Nicholas Fairclough Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Elisabeth Clara Kendall Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
James Spencer Anderson Trustee 01 January 2020
THE CLASSICAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.65m £12.13m £11.93m £12.62m £16.98m
Total expenditure £15.04m £15.37m £17.96m £21.03m £19.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £344.00k £416.00k £17.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01m £6.89m £6.74m £3.89m £4.23m
Income - Other trading activities £1.04m £0 £516.00k £576.00k £669.00k
Income - Charitable activities £8.48m £7.55m £9.87m £11.53m £12.70m
Income - Endowments £1.92m £3.92m £6.09m £1.31m £2.13m
Income - Investment £688.00k £1.06m £884.00k £447.00k £1.21m
Income - Other £344.00k £416.00k £17.00k £63.00k £291.00k
Income - Legacies £2.00k £2.96m £641.48k £2.57m £1.44m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.48m £14.18m £16.27m £19.43m £18.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £360.00k £358.22k £430.00k £495.00k £1.04m
Expenditure - Governance £59.82k £61.17k £75.77k £86.56k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £170.00k £275.00k £172.00k £24.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Other £3.19m £836.00k £1.27m £1.11m £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £76.11m £74.70m £75.51m £73.79m £73.33m
Long-term investments £99.81m £117.99m £114.33m £119.76m £132.81m
Other assets £3.16m £7.21m £9.30m £5.22m £5.91m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£8.86m -£7.09m -£4.89m -£4.45m -£2.40m
Total liabilities £19.20m £19.87m £20.42m £21.50m £22.06m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GIRTON COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0JG
Phone:
01223338999