Financial history MIFAL TZEDOKO V'CHESED LIMITED

Charity number: 1124961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/06/2020 27/06/2021 27/06/2022 27/06/2023 27/06/2024
Total gross income £815.90k £999.25k £838.36k £990.73k £7.24m
Total expenditure £694.98k £988.40k £880.70k £982.59k £7.42m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £815.90k £999.25k £838.36k £990.73k £7.24m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £673.43k £987.15k £880.70k £956.73k £7.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73 £0 £0 £500 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £31.86k £27.36k £0 £4.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £564.27k £680.69k £483.55k £587.39k £6.97m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £21.48k £1.25k £0 £25.36k £0