THE ENGLISH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the knowledge,understanding and enjoyment of the English language and its literatures and fosters good practice in its teaching and learning at all levels by holding conferences, lectures and other meetings to respond to the professional needs of teachers and lecturers in all education areas, and by publishing a range of journals, books, papers and leaflets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 July 2008: Standard registration
- 18 July 2011: Funds received from 1078935 THE ENGLISH ASSOCIATION LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Katherine Isobel Baxter | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robin Carnaby | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anshuman Ahmed Mondal | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alexander John Peter Thomson | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fiona Margaret Douglas | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Hewett | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Wallace | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Maloney | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Draper | Trustee | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JENNIFER RICHARDS | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Greg Walker FEA | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Duff FEA | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MARTIN HALLIWELL FEA | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.79k | £134.01k | £215.29k | £224.16k | £239.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.18k | £247.64k | £375.30k | £141.83k | £148.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 8 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO PROMOTE THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND ITS LITERATURES AND TO FOSTER GOOD PRACTICE IN ITS TEACHING AND LEARNING AT ALL LEVELS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
English Association
Senate House (room 244)
Malet Street
London
WC1E 7HU
- Phone:
- 01162297622
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window