Accounts and annual returns BRECKON HILL COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1125513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 10 September 2024 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 October 2024 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 20 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window