Financial history BRECKON HILL COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1125513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £111.88k £171.68k £144.42k £104.44k £126.47k
Total expenditure £83.93k £106.01k £128.81k £137.08k £120.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £17.35k £7.64k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £17.35k £22.85k