Accounts and annual returns HORIZON USER GROUP

Charity number: 1127393
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 March 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required