TEVIOT BRITISH BANGLADESHI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To promote Islamic education to the community with the provision of mother tongue and Arabic Classes for the age between 06 to 16. 2. To the regular activities, the centre provides advisory services to the local community. 3. To run mosque for daily prayers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 09 July 2008: Standard registration
- TEVIOT BANGLADESHI CULTURAL COMMUNITY GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jabed Uddin | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arif Abdur Rahmaan | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Azir Uddin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHAKATH ALI | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Syed Monjur Hussain | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL AHAD | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SELAUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHER MOHAMMAD | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMRAN ALI | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nurul Bari | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED JOYNAL ABEDIN | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Abu Syed Choudhury | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ZABED AHMED CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ashraf Ali Syed | Trustee | 12 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
USTAR UDDIN | Trustee | 21 January 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.67k | £58.64k | £62.33k | £54.43k | £51.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.44k | £51.03k | £42.67k | £34.42k | £37.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP BY 1 RELIEVING POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE SAID INHABITANTS IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE THAT MAY INCLUDE WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EMPLOYMENT AND 2 ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES 3 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS HAVING NEED OF FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
181 Teviot Street
LONDON
E14 6PY
- Phone:
- 07483457315
- Email:
- tbba1818@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window