Accounts and annual returns ACADEMIES ENTERPRISE TRUST

Charity Number: 1125603
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 25 July 2011 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 19 May 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 23 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 23 March 2010 On Time