Financial history WIDOWS AND ORPHANS RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT (WORD) TRUST

Charity number: 1125095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £310 £440 £685 £895 £6.98k
Total expenditure £180 £60 £300 £855 £5.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A