Financial history MANOR HOUSE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1127604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £274.41k £714.12k £420.33k £297.78k £402.33k
Total expenditure £510.89k £602.22k £464.63k £309.67k £330.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £64.21k £292.99k £133.44k £30.00k £62.75k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £39.71k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £357.55k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £316.86k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £496.32k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £78.31k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £92.66k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £27.59k N/A N/A N/A