NEWLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty Overseas aid/Famine relief Religious activities. People of a particular ethnic or racial origin General public/Mankind. Makes grants to individuals Provides other finance Provides human resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £19,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 August 2008: Standard registration
- MINISTERIO NOVA VIDA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OMNE JESUS GUZMAN ACEVEDO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eliane Albano de Sousa | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev RAQUEL MOREIRA | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HILDEBRANDO GARCIA | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KYLE DYAL | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERESA SOFIA DE GUZMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.65k | £13.97k | £30.74k | £42.54k | £79.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.54k | £12.45k | £24.64k | £47.04k | £62.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | £19.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 2008 as amended on 02 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG PORTUGUESE SPEAKING COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE GREATER LONDON AREA (THE BENEFICIARIES) BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE BENEFICIARIES BY PROVISION OF ADVICE, ADVOCACY, TRAINING AND TRANSLATION SERVICES TO FACILITATE THEIR ACCESS TO LOCAL OR STATE SERVICES, BENEFITS, EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 FRITH ROAD
LONDON
E11 4EY
- Phone:
- 020 7476 7866
- Email:
- info@ministerio-novavida.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window