TEMPLE GARDEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Temple Garden Foundation works in partnership with local communities in rural Cambodia to promote sustainable development for those living in poverty. The Foundation selects projects where livelihoods can be improved significantly through simple community initiatives. Programmes include water and sanitation, basic road/bridge infrastructure, healthcare and child and adult education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambodia
Governance
- 01 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRAD LEVITT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fabienne Enderlin | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Saw | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Corson Ferguson | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Joseph Biro | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter E Wild | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ferguson | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Supriya Sen | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE EMMA MARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.02k | £210.58k | £260.80k | £278.46k | £373.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.61k | £235.04k | £257.66k | £244.92k | £289.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS TO SUPPORT PROJECTS TO DELIVER THE FOLLOWING ESSENTIAL SERVICES TO DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN RURAL CAMBODIA AND ELSEWHERE IN ASIA; (A) CLEAN WATER SUPPLIES; (B) HYGIENIC SEWAGE SYSTEMS; (C) HEALTHCARE SERVICES; (D) EDUCATION; AND (E) ELECTRICITY, GAS AND OTHER ESSENTIAL SUPPLIES.
Area of benefit
CAMBODIA AND ELSEWHERE IN ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Egerton Gardens
Flat 2 Egerton Gardens
London
SW3 2BS
- Phone:
- 07725977385
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window