OTLEY ALL SAINTS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS, AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES AND PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE SCHOOL, ORGANISING EVENTS TO RAISE FUNDS SPECIFIC TO SCHOOL PROJECTS AND TO BENEFIT THE WIDER LOCAL COMMUNITY IN OTLEY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 02 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luisa Carla Di Parma-Heath | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lauren Tunstall Allcock | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miles Alexander Thomas Waring | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.45k | £7.10k | £5.49k | £13.39k | £12.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.02k | £6.83k | £6.74k | £9.16k | £19.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Otley All Saints C of E Primary Sch
Lisker Drive
OTLEY
LS21 1DF
- Phone:
- 01943 464703
- Email:
- office@otleyallsaints.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window