Financial history THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION MANCHESTER BRANCH

Charity Number: 1124748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £13.86k £4.15k £4.80k £9.92k £10.56k
Total expenditure £9.48k £3.38k £4.03k £11.38k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A