Trustees CHRIST CHURCH NEWCASTLE
Charity number: 1124990

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Mullen | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Lavelle | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philippa Jane Woolley | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Gordon | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Cowton | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Pugmire | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev HUGO ARUNDALE CHARTERIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.