Financial history DERWENT RURAL COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1124775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.50m £3.28m £2.02m £2.13m £2.11m
Total expenditure £2.17m £3.03m £2.05m £2.06m £1.89m
Income from government contracts £2.47m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.50k £3.93k £10.06k £11.80k £3.95k
Income - Other trading activities £16.36k £36 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.48m £3.27m £2.01m £2.11m £2.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47 £9 £3 £136 £381
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.17m £3.03m £2.05m £2.06m £1.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.13k £6.58k £8.28k £12.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0