Financial history MADE AFRICA LIMITED

Charity Number: 1125879
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £2.04k £5.19k £1.87k £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.95k £8.14k £5.45k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0