Financial history HEEL AND TOE LTD

Charity number: 1125695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.20m £872.75k £864.37k £909.82k £910.14k
Total expenditure £795.81k £843.60k £909.62k £984.34k £962.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k £40.84k £40.84k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £549.93k £277.87k £180.32k £265.80k £264.33k
Income - Other trading activities £141.66k £230.71k £420.17k £406.33k £402.08k
Income - Charitable activities £95.37k £176.17k £200.00k £179.26k £189.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £51.81k £79.44k £60.79k £58.43k £54.02k
Income - Other £361.18k £108.56k £3.09k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £784.57k £770.08k £809.79k £877.01k £857.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.24k £73.52k £99.83k £107.34k £104.86k
Expenditure - Governance £2.46k £2.46k £2.58k £1.40k £1.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0