4TH ASHBY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group providing access to activities for scouting members, in line with Scout Organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Total income includes £450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 17 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Kirsten Rebecca Southwart | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wright | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Randall | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Davies | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Bush | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Timson | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Leake | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JONATHAN BLOOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.38k | £28.13k | £8.55k | £16.50k | £35.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.04k | £22.52k | £9.89k | £15.98k | £30.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.56k | £400 | N/A | £6.19k | £450 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 17 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 17 September 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Donisthorpe Scout Centre
3 Church Street
Donisthorpe
DE12 7PX
- Phone:
- 01530888579
- Email:
- jon.bloor@4thashby.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window