Financial history E SLATER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1125104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.79k £19.85k £20.62k £56.36k £21.46k
Total expenditure £30.02k £30.45k £27.74k £41.54k £43.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A