PARENTS ASSOCIATION OF MARIA KONOPNICKA POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOLWILLESDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of children attending Polish School of Maria Konopnicka in Willesden Green by maintaining and developing the school and providing resources and teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Brent
Governance
- 08 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agnieszka Grzybowska | Chair | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iwona Cieslinska | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Iwaszkiewicz | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rafal Machnik | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Baranowska | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Urszula Pedzik | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wioletta Edyta Gnys | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dariusz Ludwinski | Trustee | 09 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.96k | £118.02k | £100.95k | £120.78k | £122.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.90k | £117.92k | £133.80k | £120.87k | £111.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £7.74k | £24.00k | £20.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED 25 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 11 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE POLISH SCHOOL OF MARIA KONOPNICKA IN WILLESDEN, BY TEACHING OF THE POLISH LANGUAGE, THE HISTORY AND GEOGRAPHY OF POLAND, ITS RELIGION AND CULTURE AND BY PREPARING THE PUPILS FOR THE POLISH GCE, AS AND A2 LEVEL EXAMINATIONS.
Area of benefit
WILLESDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys & St. Johns C Of E School
Downage
LONDON
NW4 1AB
- Phone:
- 07539269990
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window