THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION HERTFORD AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support to the Regiment by attendance & participation in civic & military events organised by our own H.Q & other military/charitable organisation. The ongoing fostering of esprit de corps of all,including those in failing health by home visits and by regular association with members throughout the year, princably those retired.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN PAUL RICH | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEON MICHAEL CARSON | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRETT STEPHEN LEWIS | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Charles Ross | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Alan Burridge | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £2.27k | £2.64k | £2.51k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £921 | £1.76k | £988 | £1.53k | £2.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND STANDARD BRANCH RULES APPROVED ON 26 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
PLEASE REFER TO THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 214015)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 FORDWICH RISE
HERTFORD
SG14 2DF
- Phone:
- 01992581564
- Email:
- burridge.eric@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window