ST FAITH'S SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1124905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PRVIDING EXTRA CURRICULUM ACTIVITIES FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,212
Total expenditure: £6,509

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2008: Standard registration
  • 09 February 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 July 2016: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Cameron Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Odete Lauritzson Trustee 14 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £15.04k £7.32k £7.57k £12.92k £8.21k
Total expenditure £9.08k £10.76k £3.05k £19.88k £6.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 January 2023 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 October 2021 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST FAITHS SCHOOL
ALMA ROAD
LONDON
SW18 1AE
Phone:
07771906080