THE NEWCASTLE - UNDER - LYME RURAL PARISHES TRANSPORT SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a community transport service for those inhabitants of the parishes of Betley,Balterley&Wrinehill; Chapel&Hill Chorlton; Keele; Madeley; Maer&Aston; and Whitmore who are in need of such a service because of age, sickness or disability (mental or physical) of poverty, or because of a lack of availability of adequate and safe public passenger services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 13 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BETTLEY-SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher John Hopkin | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Burton | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Jeremy Dunsandle Daly | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £172 | £0 | £1.97k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £1.53k | £1.87k | £3.09k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF CHAPEL & HILL CHORLTON, KEELE, MADELEY, MAER & ASTON AND WHITMORE AND SUCH OTHER PARISHES IN THE SCHEME WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
CHAPEL & HILL CHORLTON, KEELE, MADELEY, MAER & ASTON AND WHITMORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Madeley Centre
New Road
Madeley
Crewe
CW3 9DN
- Phone:
- 01270820007
- Email:
- ruralrunabout@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window