HOME-START BLACKPOOL, FYLDE AND WYRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Blackpool, Fylde and Wyre offers informal and friendly support to families with young children, providing a lifeline to parents and children in the are. Support is free, confidential and non-judgemental. The quality of this is maintained by working to national standards via Home-Start UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 July 2008: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Funds received from 1138349 HOME-START MORECAMBE AND LANCSTER LTD
- HOME-START BLACKPOOL AND FYLDE (Previous name)
- HOME-START FYLDE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Richard May | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Petch | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Wilkinson | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Walsh | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DENISE TAYLOR | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Karen Eaton | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Willder | Trustee | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENYS MARKLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.96k | £289.81k | £265.62k | £380.60k | £363.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £284.39k | £271.29k | £292.71k | £317.20k | £318.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE; WITHIN THE AREA OF FYLDE, LANCASHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS ('THE OBJECTS').
Area of benefit
LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home-Start Blackpool Fylde and Wyre
Business First Business Centre
Lancaster House
Amy Johnson Way
Blackpool
FY4 2RP
- Phone:
- 01253728615
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window