THE AFRICAN CONSERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The African Conservation and Development Foundation or ACDEF works to establish innovative projects and programmes that use holistic conservation to reduce poverty and to tackle the challenges of environmental degradation and climate change in Africa. It advocates for the sustainable use of the continent's vast arrays of renewable natural resources to improve the wellbeing of the human population.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cameroon
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Gabon
- Guinea
- Liberia
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 18 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DANIEL POUAKOUYOU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Arifique Pouakouyou | Trustee | 19 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robin Pouakouyou | Trustee | 10 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ENOW TATAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF INCORPORATION MADE 6 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES, ESPECIALLY THE FORESTS, MARINE AND TERRESTRIAL WILDLIFE RESOURCES; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES AS WELL AS EXPLORING OPTIONS FOR SUSTAINABLE ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. IN THIS CONTEXT, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS".
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 LANCASTER GATE
UPPER CAMBOURNE
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 6AT
- Phone:
- 01954719595
- Email:
- info@acdef.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window