Torquay United Community Sports Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation facilities for the playing of association football and other sports capable of improving health; to provide and assist in providing sport, recreation or other leisure time occupations of suchpersons who have need for such facilities by reason of their young, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty or social economic circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 23 July 2008: Standard registration
- TORQUAY UNITED COMMUNITY SPORTS AND EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert James Dickinson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Tony Jordan | Trustee | 05 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES ROSS WILSON | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|||||
SIMON BAKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN PETER SHELLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.21k | £137.13k | £170.80k | £198.84k | £242.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.72k | £145.48k | £169.70k | £203.56k | £244.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2024
(These accounts |
21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JUNE 2008 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 MARCH 2010 as amended on 22 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF DEVON AND SURROUNDING AREAS:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TORQUAY UNITED ASSOCIATED FOOTBALL
PLAINMOOR GROUND
WARBRO ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ1 3PS
- Phone:
- 01803322551
- Email:
- community@torquayunited.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window