GIDEON ORPHANAGE HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Relief of poverty, sickness and distress among abandoned, orphaned and abused children up to the age of 16 years in England, Wales and Nigeria by the provision of food, accommodation, and other basic necessities and the advancement of education for the benefit among abandoned, orphaned and abused children up to the age of 16 years in England, Wales and Nigeria
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Birmingham City
- Bromley
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Enfield
- Essex
- Hackney
- Kent
- Thurrock
- Nigeria
Governance
- 30 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUWATOYIN BANJO | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olayinka Abdulkareem Sulu | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatoyin Banjo | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
OLAWALE BANJO | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY IKOTUN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED 12 7 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG ABANDONED, ORPHANED AND ABUSED CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 16 YEARS IN NIGERIA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER BASIC NECESSITIES AND 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG ABANDONED, ORPHANED AND ABUSED CHILDREN UP TO THE AE OF 16 YEARS IN NIGERIA.
Area of benefit
NIGERIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HIGH TOR VIEW
LONDON
SE28 0LN
- Phone:
- 00447944691783
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window