FOR CHRIST'S SAKE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1125148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

HOLDING REGULAR PUBLIC SERVICES TO SHARE THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ON FOLLOWING THE TEACHINGS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 May 2024

Total income: £7,149
Total expenditure: £7,096

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow
  • Milton Keynes
  • Ireland
  • Nigeria
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dennis Hines Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
REVEREND EDMOND FOWOWE Trustee
None on record
Rev SANDRA JEAN HICKS BA HONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/05/2020 28/05/2021 28/05/2022 28/05/2023 28/05/2024
Total gross income £6.82k £6.63k £6.21k £6.06k £7.15k
Total expenditure £7.83k £2.75k £7.03k £6.16k £7.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 May 2024 22 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2023 26 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 May 2020 06 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
58 CLEAVERS AVENUE
CONNIBURROW
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 7BU
Phone:
07930254399