BROOK FARM ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recue animals from distress who are in need of care and rehome where appropriate or provide sanctuary for the rest of their lives in the case of domesticated animals. Where possible wild animals are released back into their natural habitat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEANNA KATE RICHARDSON | Chair | 11 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
dominic iles | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEX KEECH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2019 | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.31k | £44.90k | £75.20k | £56.11k | £53.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.37k | £41.26k | £66.31k | £63.47k | £57.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days | |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 23 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS INCLUDING WILD ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASONS OF SICKNESS NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT AND WHERE APPROPRIATE TO RE-HOME OR RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT ON MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brook Farm Animal Sanctuary
Brook Farm Cottage
Brooks Road
Raunds
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamp
- Phone:
- 01933626906
- Email:
- admin@bfas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window