FRIENDS OF MARY STANFORD LIFEBOAT HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds to restore a Grade II Listed lifeboat house for community use and education regarding the Mary Stanford Lifeboat Disaster
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUI STANFORD | Chair |
|
||||||
MARTIN JAMES GELDART | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
IAN LISTER MANN | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
JENNER ALEX SANDS | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ROSE LYWARD | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEVE TOLLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102 | £310 | £1.06k | £657 | £3.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £319 | £145 | £249 | £635 | £701 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE MARY STANFORD LIFEBOAT HOUSE, RYE HARBOUR, EAST SUSSEX, ITS OPERATION AND HISTORY.
Area of benefit
EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Rye Harbour Road
RYE
East Sussex
TN31 7TR
- Phone:
- 07979 524108
- Email:
- jacqueline.stanford@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window