BRIDGNORTH ENDOWED SCHOOL FUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils attending Bridgnorth Endowed School by providing and assisting inthe provision of such facilities or items at the school (not provided form statutory funds) as the trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 29 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Freathy | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Penn | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Follette | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Underhill | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.22k | £117.69k | £7.34k | £55.71k | £237.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.05k | £106.58k | £20.60k | £48.12k | £215.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 September 2020 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING BRIDGNORTH ENDOWED SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BRIDGNORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHGATE
BRIDGNORTH
WV16 4ER
- Phone:
- 01746762103
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window