LEWISHAM CHURCHES CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help older people living in south Lewisham improve their quality of life through befriending and helping them to access other services. To respond to the needs of older ,vulnerable, unsupported people in the community, regardless of faith or culture, through groups which meet regularly and offer companionship and an opportunity to share an interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £21,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lewisham
Governance
- 20 October 2008: Standard registration
- AGEING WELL IN LEWISHAM (LCC) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gregory Brooks | Chair | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Warren | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Howell | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hemeson | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hennessy | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Layo Segun | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Thomas Bishop | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Henry ANTHONY ATHERTON | Trustee | 22 December 2013 |
|
|||||
GRACE BLYTH | Trustee | 13 October 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.29k | £23.56k | £18.24k | £50.53k | £63.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.41k | £23.54k | £35.75k | £49.93k | £49.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.74k | £3.92k | N/A | N/A | £21.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 13 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF VULNERABLE OLDER PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF THEIR FAITH OR CULTURE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Grove Centre Church
2 Jews Walk
LONDON
SE26 6PL
- Phone:
- 02086983735
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window