NEWCASTLE CHINESE HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly activities:Tai Chi, dancing & singing classes; Monthly activities: health talk, health walk, cooking & arts and crafts class; Annual: thematic conference & outing; Others: BME advocacy and Shelter Housing drop-in advice sessions,food safety certificate courses; We also actively participate in City Council's, BEACON's and a number of large organisations' activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 29 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yuen Ho Lee | Chair | 06 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shiu Ping Yeung | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ip | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lai Ping Kwan | Trustee | 09 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sau Ying Lo | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mu Qing Chan Yu | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHUI KUEN CHEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWAI CHING WONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA W CHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.51k | £1.02k | £1.58k | £19.39k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.12k | £1.24k | £4.83k | £15.06k | £5.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF CHINESE ETHNIC ORIGIN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION RELATING TO HEALTH ISSUES, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 West Pelton House
West Pelton
STANLEY
County Durham
DH9 6SG
- Phone:
- 07944582848
- Email:
- enquiry@nchlc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window