MIDDLESBROUGH AND ESTON METHODIST CIRCUIT YOUTH WORKS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an all-inclusive service for young people aged 11-19 years. Our activities include youth clubs & a drop-in facility, trips and activities, and individual support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 28 August 2008: Standard registration
- 22 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YOUTH WORKS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.17k | £45.92k | £30.80k | £37.02k | £21.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.58k | £44.53k | £44.85k | £29.80k | £21.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 06 November 2014 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 05 August 2013 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 05 August 2013 | 36 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 25 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 25 June 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 19 LIVING IN MIDDLESBROUGH AND ESTON BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. B ADVANCING EDUCATION. C RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT. D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MIDDLESBROUGH AND ESTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window