CHRISTIAN LIAISON FOR YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with children in Huish Episcopi Academy and in Langport, Somerton and other local village communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 05 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Graham Coles | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Austin | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DAVID CREEGAN | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
David William Nevile Aston | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bruce Faulkner | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEFF CRACKNELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.35k | £4.46k | £3.71k | £2.51k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45k | £4.40k | £4.30k | £2.96k | £72 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/11/2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE HUISH EPISCOPAL SCHOOL ( SCIENCE, LANGUAGES AND VOCATIONAL COLLAGE.) TO ADVANCE LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
THE HUISH EPISCOPAL SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dava
St. Cleers
SOMERTON
TA11 6HL
- Phone:
- 01458270237
- Email:
- paulandvicky@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window