Financial history APOSTOLIC FAITH CHURCH KRUGGER (MUGODHI) UK

Charity Number: 1126590
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £6.11k £3.54k £5.92k £6.00k £10.27k
Total expenditure £6.93k £5.25k £6.50k £5.81k £9.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0