TANZEEMUS SUNNAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing general education within Bangladeshi community in the UK and Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 20 August 2008: Standard registration
- Islamic Research and Da'wah Council UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHANA CHOWDHURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMOD ZIAUR RAHMAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEAB UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £4.00k | £9.70k | £8.96k | £7.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.40k | £3.67k | £7.90k | £7.35k | £6.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2023 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR BETTER PROVISION OF EDUCATION TO THE DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE OF BANGLADESH AND PROVIDE THE MOTHER TONGUE AND CULTURAL EDUCATION TO THE CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. A TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST BANGLADESHI ELDERLY PEOPLE. B THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CITIZENS OF BANGLADESH. C TO WORK FOR THE ERADICATION OF POVERTY THROUGH INTERNATIONAL ASSISTED PROGRAMMERS.
Area of benefit
BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Lister House
Lomas Street
London
E1 5BG
- Phone:
- 07930142376
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window