THE JUBILEE AND SHELLEY SHAKMAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the trust is the provision of housing and accommodation for persons who are in need, hardship and distress and those who are resident in the area of benefit. In relation to the Jubilee Homes property the trustees must give preference firstly to married couples in need as result of age and infirmity and secondly, individuals who are in need as a result of age and infirmity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER LORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sumitra Patel | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Chamberlain | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Bedford | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PENSON | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN ASHTON JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADELINE BARBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN JOHN COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD JONATHAN AXE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.17k | £67.82k | £63.35k | £271.49k | £131.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.67k | £87.67k | £144.37k | £111.50k | £174.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO A) ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND C) IN THE CASE OF THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS JUBILEE HOMES ( THE PROPERTY NUMBERED 1 IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME ), THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE; 1) FIRSTLY TO MARRIED COUPLES WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF AGE OR INFIRMITY; AND 2) SECONDLY TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF AGE OR INFIRMITY. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 4) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENGORE
STYLECROFT ROAD
CHALFONT ST. GILES
HP8 4HY
- Phone:
- 07973402924
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window