Financial history THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS

Charity number: 1125383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £45.32m £36.73m £43.38m £43.83m £38.11m
Total expenditure £37.78m £30.81m £33.18m £36.67m £46.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £27.96m £26.41m £22.29m £25.54m £17.91m
Income - Other trading activities £12.30m £7.07m £12.26m £11.36m £12.30m
Income - Charitable activities £5.04m £3.25m £8.83m £6.27m £7.33m
Income - Endowments £625.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.61k £470 £5.94k £655.00k £565.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £583.97k £842.12k £272.40k £1.04m £833.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £27.17m £21.80m £23.57m £25.60m £32.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.60m £8.27m £9.43m £10.75m £13.36m
Expenditure - Governance £81.65k £71.68k £81.66k £89.00k £134.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £5.89k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £16.83k £735.85k £178.87k £319.00k £323.00k